Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1040 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18843 Week
» 71859 Month
» 191386 Year
» 3218239 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D428 |
18/06/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50028 |
16/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Tiger |
10/05/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/06/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/06/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D428 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50028 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Tiger' at Old Oak Common |
|
|
01/02/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50028 |
|
|
06/07/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Coopers Metals: at Old Oak Common |
|
|