Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1849 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15255 Week
» 68271 Month
» 187798 Year
» 3214651 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Pre Grouping |
81 |
m/e |
03/1914 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
9671 |
y/e |
1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (2nd) |
13801 |
y/e |
1932 |
British Railways |
53801 |
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
SDJR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 03/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/06/1961 (At Derby Works) |
Withdrawal Notes |
At Derby Works |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1914 |
22C |
|
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/06/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/11/1955 |
Derby MPD |
In spite of recent Midland Class 4 withdrawals, Nos. 43913/8/42 were all ex-works in Derby Shed Yard on 27/11/1955, with No. 43900 working a ballast train at the north end of the yard. Other interesting engines in the yard, repainted ex-works were Compound No 40936; S.D.J. No. 53801 and Nos. 41752, 58192/9, while Nos. 58182 an 47234 had received Service repairs. |
SLS/195602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1914 |
To Service |
To service as S&DJR Number 81 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
1930 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9671 |
|
|
1932 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 13801 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 53801 |
|
|
19/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 53801 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|