Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 296 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4933 Week
» 16226 Month
» 280859 Year
» 1502424 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
S&DJR 89 m/e 07/1925
LMS (1st) 9679 y/e 1930
LMS (2nd) 13809 y/e 1932
BR 53809 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 7F
Company History SDJR/LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 07/1925
Withdrawal Mon 01/06/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1925
22C Bath Green Park (S&D) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 01/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   2w/e 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop, no. 1 bay) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
19/09/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
16/10/1961 Derby MPD (16C) (Ex Works on Shed) Ex Works on Shed: 42283, 47611, 48225/79, 48352, 53809, 75034. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1925 To Service To service as S&DJR Number 89
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1930 Renumbered Renumbered to 9679    
1932 Renumbered Renumbered to 13809    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C)    
17/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 53809    
08/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 53809    

prev prev