Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 462 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1847 Week
» 8652 Month
» 115598 Year
» 1337163 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4283 m/e 06/1920

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 42xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1920
Withdrawal During 10/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965
Service Life 44 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 09/10/1954
88H Tondu 4w/e 04/05/1963
88C Barry 3w/e 04/05/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 88H Tondu 4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 88C Barry 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   3w/e 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev