Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D429 21/06/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50029 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Renown 26/10/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 21/06/1968
Withdrawn 25/03/1992
Withdrawal Reason Power unit
Time in Service 23 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 30/06/2002
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 21/06/1968
91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 28/02/1976
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 06/03/1976
LA Laira 2w/e 11/12/1976
   Withdrawn 25/03/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/06/1968 To Service To service as D429
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50029    
28/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
06/03/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
11/12/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
26/10/1978 Naming Named 'Renown' at Old Oak Common    
25/03/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 50029    

prev prev