Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3865 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22776 Week
» 87730 Month
» 290394 Year
» 3317247 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4292 |
m/e |
10/1921 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
220 |
To Service |
During 10/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/10/1964 |
Service Life |
43 yrs , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
ALLOC |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
5w/e |
30/03/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4292 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
09/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4292 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|