Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 709 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14115 Week
» 67131 Month
» 186658 Year
» 3213511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D430 |
25/06/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50030 |
23/03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Repulse |
10/04/1978 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/06/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/11/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D430 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
23/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50030 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/04/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Repulse' at Laira |
|
|
08/04/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50030 |
|
|
30/06/2002 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|