Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 71 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2110 Week
» 21436 Month
» 248197 Year
» 759299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D430 25/06/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50030 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Repulse 10/04/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 25/06/1968
Withdrawn 08/04/1992
Withdrawal Reason Main generator
Time in Service 23 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 30/06/2002
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 25/06/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/05/1974
LA Laira 2w/e 11/12/1976
   Withdrawn 08/04/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1968 To Service To service as D430
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
20/08/1971 Sightings Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Inside the shed - blue with full yellow ends. Keith Long Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50030    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
11/12/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
10/04/1978 Naming Named 'Repulse' at Laira    
08/04/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 50030    

prev prev