Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 387 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 1259 Week
» 13037 Month
» 302429 Year
» 813531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D431 01/07/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50031 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Hood 28/06/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 01/07/1968
Withdrawn 01/08/1991
Withdrawal Reason Wheelsets
Time in Service 23 yrs , 1 mth
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 01/07/1968
LA Laira w/e 08/05/1976
   Withdrawn 01/08/1991

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/07/1968 To Service To service as D431
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
13/07/1969 Sightings Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. RO 10/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50031    
08/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
28/06/1978 Naming Named 'Hood' at Laira    
01/08/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 50031    

prev prev