Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D433 19/07/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50033 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Glorious 26/06/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 19/07/1968
Withdrawn 25/03/1994
Withdrawal Reason Surplus to requirements
Time in Service 25 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 19/07/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/05/1974
LA Laira 3w/e 09/10/1976
   Withdrawn 25/03/1994

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/07/1968 To Service To service as D433
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
27/12/1971 Sightings Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot RO 517 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50033    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
09/10/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
26/06/1978 Naming Named 'Glorious' at Laira    
25/03/1994 Withdrawn Condemned as 50033    

prev prev