Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 3981 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17387 Week
» 70403 Month
» 189930 Year
» 3216783 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D436 |
12/08/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50036 |
28/10/1973 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Victorious |
16/05/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/08/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D436 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3806 Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
28/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50036 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
16/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Victorious' at Laira |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
12/04/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50036 |
|
|
03/07/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|