Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 927 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14333 Week
» 67349 Month
» 186876 Year
» 3213729 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D438 |
16/09/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50038 |
23/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Formidable |
05/05/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/09/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/09/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D438 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3808 Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
23/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50038 |
|
|
04/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
05/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Formidable' at Laira |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
27/09/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50038 |
|
|
06/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|