Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 799 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2707 Week
» 18905 Month
» 183805 Year
» 694907 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D440 25/09/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50040 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Leviathan (removed 06/1987) 15/09/1978
Centurion 08/07/1987

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 25/09/1968
Withdrawn 03/08/1990
Withdrawal Reason Worn out power unit
Time in Service 21 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 31/07/2008
Cut At Sims Metals (Halesowen)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 25/09/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/05/1974
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 25/05/1974
BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 10/04/1976
   Withdrawn 03/08/1990

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/09/1968 To Service To service as D440
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
13/07/1969 Sightings Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. RO 10/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50040    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
25/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
10/04/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
15/09/1978 Naming Named 'Leviathan' at Laira    
08/07/1987 Naming Renamed 'Centurion' at Laira    
03/08/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 50040    
31/07/2008 Scrapped Broken up by Sims Metals: Halesowen    

prev prev