Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4211 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17617 Week
» 70633 Month
» 190160 Year
» 3217013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D443 |
04/10/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50043 |
16/03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Eagle |
26/06/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/10/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
03/1970 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS, Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/10/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D443 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3813 Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50043 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
26/06/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Eagle' at Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
01/02/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50043 |
|
|
01/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Raxstar: at Blaenavon & Pontypool Railway |
|
|