Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 143 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6120 Week
» 22318 Month
» 187218 Year
» 698320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D444 11/10/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50044 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Exeter 27/04/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 11/10/1968
Withdrawn 01/01/1991
Withdrawal Reason Main generator
Time in Service 22 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) 11/10/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 04/05/1974
   Withdrawn 01/01/1991

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/10/1968 To Service To service as D444
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50044    
04/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
27/04/1978 Naming Named 'Exeter' at Laira    
01/01/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 50044    

prev prev