Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1034 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18837 Week
» 71853 Month
» 191380 Year
» 3218233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2615 |
m/e |
08/1908 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8824 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
British Railways |
48824 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
19" Goods |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4794 |
To Service |
During 08/1908 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1950 |
Service Life |
41 yrs , 6 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1908 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
02/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1945 |
Longsight MPD |
Unusual visitors during October were: 4178 19B, 5185 10B, 5219 26A, 8824 10A, 9053 10A, 12378 26E. |
SLS/194601 |
31/01/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The last two Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E467 (Nos. 4766 and 4767 ) were completed on 17/12 and 30/12 respectively. The latter engine is fitted with outside Stephenson's valve gear and both engines are equipped with electric lighting. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6162 , which was completed on 19/12. No. 6154 is the next to be dealt with. The next 'Pacific' No. 6257 (No. 5 of Order E464) is rapidly taking shape together with the first Class '5' 4-6-0 under Order E468 (ten engines), No. 4748; this batch are all to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear and roller bearings. The L.M.S. lettering has already started to disappear from both tank and tender sides, but so far, locomotives receiving a general repair are still being repainted in the new standard livery. A recent interesting visitor to the Works was ex L.N.W.R. 4-6-0 No. 8824, which received a service repair. More ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap-heap; they were cut up as follows: (W/E 20/12) 7944, 25845; (W/E 27/12) 6725, 9380; (W/E 3/1) 9215, 27663; (W/E 10/1) 9115, 28401; (W/E 17/1) 25694. |
SLS/194802 |
02/12/1949 |
Wigan Station |
On 2/12 No, 8824-the last ex-L.N.W.R. 4-6-0 in service-was seen shunting just south of Wigan station. An ex-L. & Y. 0-6-0 was noted here bearing the unusual number M52053, with 'L.M.S.' on the tender. |
SLS/195001 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1908 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2615 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4794 |
|
|
08/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8824 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 48824 but not taken up |
|
|
1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8824 |
|
|