|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1948 | Glasgow Area | Class '5' No. 44702 and '3F' No. 57653 are to be repaired at Cowlairs. Their premature shopping is due to collision damage. The new Class 'L.1' 2-6-4T's are being run in at Hamilton (27C), as neither Eastfield nor Polmadie have jobs for them. | SLS/194901 |
30/11/1948 | Cowlairs Works | No. 55204 (31C) was ex Cowlairs Works during W/E 20/11, - still retaining L.M.S. on the tanks and the 31C shed plate. The buffer-beam was in true L.N.E.R. style, carrying the Power Classification, No. and shed-St. Rollox. No. 44702 (31A) was in Cowlairs Yard on 4/12. | SLS/194901 |
30/04/1950 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 153, 40598, 615, 40647, 41092, 42205/06, 42421, 42908, 44283, 44702/03/84/96, 4923, 44931/59/74/79/91, 45009/22/23, 45159/73, 45251, 45362, 45456/62, 45714/27, 54440, 55139, 15168, 15352, 16154, 16250/80, 16307, 56335, 16350, 17253, 57463, 57955. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/08/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 44702 Built at Horwich Works |
||
13/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
07/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
26/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44702 | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |