Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 168 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4680 Week
» 27186 Month
» 330376 Year
» 1551941 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 44703 on 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 28/08/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/12/1966
Scrapping During 04/1967
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 28/08/1948
68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 19/05/1951
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 06/08/1955
65A Eastfield 9w/e 26/11/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 31A St Rollox (Balornock) w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 06/08/1955
ALLOC 63A Perth South 3w/e 03/12/1966
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 153, 40598, 615, 40647, 41092, 42205/06, 42421, 42908, 44283, 44702/03/84/96, 4923, 44931/59/74/79/91, 45009/22/23, 45159/73, 45251, 45362, 45456/62, 45714/27, 54440, 55139, 15168, 15352, 16154, 16250/80, 16307, 56335, 16350, 17253, 57463, 57955. SLS/195006
30/08/1961 St. Rollox Works (Paint Shop) Erecting Shop: D3005, D3206/78, D3913, D5314/6/7, D6116, 42059, 44877, 44976, 45011/23/49, 45245, 45360, 45679/91. Paint Shop: 44703. Outside Paint Shop: 42805, 45366, 45677. Works Yard: D5309, 44721, 45018, 57617, 57658. Works Shunter: D3342. SLS/196110
02/11/1963 Inverurie Works (Shopped) Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/08/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 44703
Built at Horwich Works
   
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
06/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
26/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 44703    

prev prev