Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 712 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18515 Week
» 71531 Month
» 191058 Year
» 3217911 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
44705 |
on |
11/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
192 |
To Service |
Fri 11/09/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 02/09/1966 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1966 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
11/09/1948 |
29A |
|
Perth South |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/09/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
28C |
Carstairs |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
29A |
Perth South |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/06/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (In Erecting Shop) |
In Erecting Shop: 44705, 45047/53, 45136/78, 45365, 45473, D363, D3341, D3416, D3544, D3926, D5116, D5305/9, D8076. Awaiting works : 42880, 44796, 45423, D5366. Ex Works: 45360. Diesel Test House: D265, D6123. Works Shunters: D2736, D3005, D3279, D8070. Stored : D6100/1/2/6/7/14/7/20/4/5/7/30 and GSWR 0-6-0T (ex Hafod Colliery). |
SLS/196307 |
11/07/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 42124, 42259, 42780, 44705/787, 45365, 45473, D359, D3009, D3533, D3741, D5128, D6124, D8076. Waiting Works: 42196, 42274, 42699, 42735, 44701, 45178. D3563, D5356. Ex-Works: 42736, 45053, D6123. Diesel Test House: D361, D3557. Works Shunters: D3412/6. Stored: GSWR 0-6-0T, D6100/1/2/4/6/7/14/8/20/5/7/30. |
SLS/196308 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 44705 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (29A) |
|
|
02/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44705 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|