Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4297 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17703 Week
» 70719 Month
» 190246 Year
» 3217099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
44732 |
on |
28/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
192 |
To Service |
Sat 28/02/1949 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/07/1967 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 44732 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44732 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|