31/10/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Further Class '5' 4-6-0's have been completed as follows: Nos. 4761 (25/9), 4762 (2/10) and 4763 (9/10). Work has not yet started on the next 'Royal Scot' conversion (No. 6162), but the next two 'Patriot' rebuilds (Nos. 5540 and 5531) are receiving attention; the former will be completed by the end of October. Two further Class '7' 4-6-2's have had the streamline casing removed, viz.: Nos. 6228 (w/e 27/9) and 6245 (w/e 4/10), thus leaving only four streamlined 'Pacifics' on the L.M.S.: Nos. 6226, 6229, 6236 an 6243. The number of withdrawn locos. lying in the Works has been further reduced. The following engines have been cut up since 20/9: Nos. 6748 (w/e 12/10), 6650 (w/e 27/9), 6685 (w/e 27/9), 6704 (w/e 11/10), 6660 (w/e 4/10) and 25841 (w/e 4/10). The conversion of '8F' 2-8-0 No. 8653 to oil-burning was completed on 14/10 and No. 8606 will be similarly dealt with. 'Patriot' Class: No. 5518 now has the nameplates Bradshaw uncovered. 'Royal Scot' Class: No. 6144 has had its name restored after running without it continuously since well before the war. |
SLS/194711 |
07/12/1947 |
Crewe Works |
New Construction 7/12: In addition to Nos. 6256 and 4765 mentioned, No. 4766 was complete. No. 4767 had the frames, cylinders and boiler mounted, No. 4748 frames and cylinders-boiler not yet mounted-while frames and cylinders for Nos. 4749/50 were all in the Erecting Shop. The frames and cylinders of Nos: 4751/2 were in the Yard, while the Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for No. 6257. The frames only of Nos. 4753/54/55 were visible. Nos. 4759/61 were under repair, while No. 4762 was on the North Shed. No less than 13 of the L.N.E.R. '0.6's' were on the Works. |
SLS/194801 |
29/02/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The first two engines of Order E 468, Nos. 4748 and 4749 , were completed on 15/1 and 6/2 respectively. They are the first of ten engines to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear together with roller-bearing axle-boxes. The appearance of these engines differs somewhat from that of the previous Class '5' 4-6-0's, the most outstanding features being a lowered foot-framing, involving the use of splashers over the coupled wheels, and the main steam pipes, which, set well forward, are coupled to the front end of each steam chest. The camshaft is driven from a gearbox mounted on the leading coupled axle, between the frames. This is connected, by means of a universal shaft, to the cross-driving gearbox, which, situated beneath the smokebox saddle, imparts rotary motion direct to the camshaft. A small instruction plate inside the cab advises drivers to work the engine with a fully-open regulator varying the cut-off to suit gradients, etc. No. 4748 underwent trials on 4/2. One more Class '7P' 4-6-2 has had the streamline casing removed, this was No. *6236 during w/e 7/2 (*This now leaves only two (Nos. 6226/43) to be dealt with). No. 6229, which had the, streamline casing removed in 12/47, went into traffic early in January, in standard .L.M.S. livery, but with a blank tender side. Since then, however, all newly-painted locomotives have had 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' painted on the tender side and the prefix 'M' added, above the number on the cab side, and also beside the number on the smokebox door. All numerals and letters are in a new Gill Sans style, unlined. Several locomotives have already been experimentally painted in various colours. Among these were L.M.S. Class '5' 4-6-0's Nos. 4762-4 and 5292 , painted S.R. green, L.N.E.R. green, G.W.R. green, and black respectively. All four engines were lined on the left-hand side only, the lining on each engine being standard with that used by the pre-nationalised company represented. The style of lining applied to No. 5292 is reminiscent of L. & N.W.R. livery; this engine has since returned to Works, and has been lined on the right-hand side also. These four locomotives were noted at Crewe on the evening of 28/1, apparently just off Works, but they have since been seen in regular service. The number of withdrawn locomotives standing, in the Works' yard has been further reduced. Engines recently cut up include Nos. 9206, 25694, 28343 W/E 17/1, and Nos. 9374, 28546/50 , W/E 24/1 |
SLS/194803 |
07/05/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. |
SLS/196106 |
15/11/1963 |
Crewe Works (Yard) |
Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). |
SLS/196312 |
09/02/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. |
SLS/196403 |