07/12/1947 |
Crewe Works |
New Construction 7/12: In addition to Nos. 6256 and 4765 mentioned, No. 4766 was complete. No. 4767 had the frames, cylinders and boiler mounted, No. 4748 frames and cylinders-boiler not yet mounted-while frames and cylinders for Nos. 4749/50 were all in the Erecting Shop. The frames and cylinders of Nos: 4751/2 were in the Yard, while the Heavy Machine Shop contained the frames and cylinders for No. 6257. The frames only of Nos. 4753/54/55 were visible. Nos. 4759/61 were under repair, while No. 4762 was on the North Shed. No less than 13 of the L.N.E.R. '0.6's' were on the Works. |
SLS/194801 |
31/01/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The last two Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E467 (Nos. 4766 and 4767 ) were completed on 17/12 and 30/12 respectively. The latter engine is fitted with outside Stephenson's valve gear and both engines are equipped with electric lighting. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6162 , which was completed on 19/12. No. 6154 is the next to be dealt with. The next 'Pacific' No. 6257 (No. 5 of Order E464) is rapidly taking shape together with the first Class '5' 4-6-0 under Order E468 (ten engines), No. 4748; this batch are all to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear and roller bearings. The L.M.S. lettering has already started to disappear from both tank and tender sides, but so far, locomotives receiving a general repair are still being repainted in the new standard livery. A recent interesting visitor to the Works was ex L.N.W.R. 4-6-0 No. 8824, which received a service repair. More ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap-heap; they were cut up as follows: (W/E 20/12) 7944, 25845; (W/E 27/12) 6725, 9380; (W/E 3/1) 9215, 27663; (W/E 10/1) 9115, 28401; (W/E 17/1) 25694. |
SLS/194802 |
31/12/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
31/01/1949 |
Crewe Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand. Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox. Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides. Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three. |
SLS/194903 |
04/06/1961 |
Crewe Works (Works Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. |
SLS/196107 |
23/07/1961 |
Crewe Works (Works Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. |
SLS/196109 |