Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1364 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14770 Week
» 67786 Month
» 187313 Year
» 3214166 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4772 |
m/e |
05/1947 |
British Railways |
44772 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
187 |
To Service |
During 05/1947 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1967 |
Service Life |
20 yrs , 5 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1947 |
32A |
|
Inverness |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5A |
|
Crewe North |
w/e |
31/01/1948 |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4772 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A) |
|
|
31/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44772 |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44772 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|