Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 504 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6258 Week
» 34216 Month
» 68858 Year
» 1290423 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4794 m/e 08/1947
BR 44794 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 08/1947
Withdrawal Sat 22/04/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27A Polmadie 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 02/10/1954
63A Perth South 5w/e 31/12/1966
   Withdrawn 22/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27A Polmadie w/e 16/08/1947
ALLOC 63A Perth South 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 63A Perth South 3w/e 03/12/1966
WDN   22/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1947 To Service To service as LMS Number 4794
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44794    
02/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 44794    

prev prev