Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 299 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7369 Week
» 4477 Month
» 111423 Year
» 1332988 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4806 m/e 07/1944
BR 44806 w/e 25/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Service Life 24 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
21A Saltley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B Kentish Town 4w/e 29/12/1956
16A Nottingham 4w/e 30/11/1957
16F Burton w/e 12/09/1964
8C Speke Junction w/e 13/03/1965
10D Lostock Hall w/e 20/04/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 29/12/1956
LOAN 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 16F Burton w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall w/e 11/05/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as LMS Number 4806
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44806    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
13/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
20/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 44806    

prev prev