Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3024 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16430 Week
» 69446 Month
» 188973 Year
» 3215826 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4813 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
44813 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 10/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/09/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1944 |
21A |
|
Saltley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
1F |
|
Rugby |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
5C |
|
Stafford |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
5D |
|
Stoke |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
1F |
Rugby |
4w/e |
02/05/1964 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
2w/e |
10/04/1965 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
07/08/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/02/1966 |
Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) |
Ex Works: 44806, 45350, 48683, 70045; Waiting Works: 44813, 45235/48, 47480/681, 48248, 78034. |
SLS/196604 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4813 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44813 |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
03/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44813 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|