|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/11/1945 | Willesden | No. 28786, one of the last survivors of the L.N.W. 19in. goods worked a goods train from Willesden on 24/11/45. This is the first known appearance of one of these engines in London for many years. | SLS/194605 |
06/04/1946 | Market Harborough | On 6/4/46 the three parts of the 12 noon ex St. Pancras were hauled by 5279 (14B); 5259 (10C); and 5715 (12A), respectively. In the up direction, the 2.40 p.m. ex Leicester was behind 4808 (5A), whilst of the two portions of the 4.50 p.m. ex Leicester (nominally a 19G duty) were worked by 5105 (26A), and 4815 (17A). | SLS/194605 |
08/04/1962 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4815 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) | ||
16/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44815 | ||
10/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
18/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
23/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (16C) | ||
10/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
24/02/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44815 | ||
06/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |