Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 814 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18617 Week
» 71633 Month
» 191160 Year
» 3218013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4825 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
44825 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1946 |
First D40 withdrawn |
6914 was the first locomotive of its class to be withdrawn, |
SLS/194605 |
15/04/1946 |
Midland Section |
4825 has been fitted with a self-cleaning smoke-box (15/4). 2683 (26A) was noted at Wellingborough, running light, on 20/3. An interesting working for which Bedford shed is responsible is a trip to Gloucester. The route is via Northampton and Stratford, and the locomotive, usually a 3F, is due out at 3 a.m, and does not re-turn until late at night. |
SLS/194605 |
20/07/1948 |
Crewe Works |
July 20th saw the completion of No. 44747, the last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 469; this was followed by Nos. 41210 and 41211 , the first 2-6-2T's of Order E 470, completed on 29/7 and 4/8 respectively. These engines differ from those of the previous batch in that they are fitted for 'motor train' working. The first two engines are also equipped with a modified cylinder lubricator (mechanical), in which the oil level may be observed through a glass set in one side of the lubricator casting. No. 5525 is the latest 'Patriot' 4-6-0 to be rebuilt, and was completed on 29/7. No. 5527 will follow shortly. The ranks of ex L.N.W.R. locomotives continue to be thinned, the following locomotives having gone to the scrap heap since the end of June: W/E 3/7, Nos. 6686, 7740, 28350; W/E 24/7, Nos. 6909, 9103, 9201; W/E 31/7, Nos. 9095 an 28261. In connection with the Centenary of the Chester & Holyhead Rly., Cornwall and Hardwicke were recently dispatched for exhibition at Conway. Three more 4-6-0's have been repainted black with ex L.N.W.R. lining. They are Class '5' No. 44825, Class '5XP' No. 45663 and Class '6P' No. 45529, which was named Stephenson W/E 24/7. Class '5' 4-6-0 No. 44755, the first double chimney Caprotti engine, has been fitted with an indicator cab across the front end for the purpose of obtaining steam distribution data |
SLS/194809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4825 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44825 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44825 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|