Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 163 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17966 Week
» 70982 Month
» 190509 Year
» 3217362 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4827 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
British Railways |
44827 |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/07/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Crewe Works |
Nos. 4758 , 4759 and 4760 the first three Class 5 4-6-0's with roller bearings (Order E467) were completed on 2/9, 11/9, and 18/9 respectively. Class 5 4-6-0's Nos. 4826 and 4827 were converted to oil-burning w/e 6/9 and 13/9 respectively whilst Nos. 4830 and 4844 were both dealt with in a similar manner during w/e 20/9. The latest 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt was No. 6111 , which was completed on 10/9. Nos. 6228 and 6245 will be the next 'Pacifics' to have the streamline casing removed. No. 6202 went into traffic again on 10/9, having been on Works since 18/8. Ex L. & .N.W.R. No. 9336 (withdrawn w/e 2/8/47) was finally cut-up during w/e 6/9/47. Additional engines cut up were: Nos. 25797 w/e 13/9, 27552 and 28603 w/e 20/9. The ex L. &Y. 0-6-2T (Stationary boiler No. 4608) has recently been through the Works and has been completely repainted black. It is lettered LMS in standard size letters on the tank sides together with the number 4608 on the bunker sides. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4827 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44827 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44827 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|