|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | Crewe Works | Nos. 4758 , 4759 and 4760 the first three Class 5 4-6-0's with roller bearings (Order E467) were completed on 2/9, 11/9, and 18/9 respectively. Class 5 4-6-0's Nos. 4826 and 4827 were converted to oil-burning w/e 6/9 and 13/9 respectively whilst Nos. 4830 and 4844 were both dealt with in a similar manner during w/e 20/9. The latest 'Royal Scot' to be rebuilt was No. 6111 , which was completed on 10/9. Nos. 6228 and 6245 will be the next 'Pacifics' to have the streamline casing removed. No. 6202 went into traffic again on 10/9, having been on Works since 18/8. Ex L. & .N.W.R. No. 9336 (withdrawn w/e 2/8/47) was finally cut-up during w/e 6/9/47. Additional engines cut up were: Nos. 25797 w/e 13/9, 27552 and 28603 w/e 20/9. The ex L. &Y. 0-6-2T (Stationary boiler No. 4608) has recently been through the Works and has been completely repainted black. It is lettered LMS in standard size letters on the tank sides together with the number 4608 on the bunker sides. | SLS/194710 |
31/08/1948 | Crewe Works | The construction of the new Class '2' 2-6-2T's is going ahead steadily, and during the past month no less than nine locomotives of this type have been turned out. They were completed as follows: Nos. 41212 (6/8), 41213 (11/8), 41214 (13/8), 41215 (18/8), 41216 (20/8), 41217 (25/8), 41218 (27/8), 41219 (1/9) and 41220 (3/9). Two more 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0's have been rebuilt with taper boilers-No. 5527 was completed on 12/8 and No. 5535 on 31/8. Nos. 5523/45 will shortly be similarly dealt with. The appearance of No. 46244 in a new shade of blue created quite a sensation among enthusiasts and enginemen alike. The engine is lined black and white, together with the British Railways' crest displayed on the tender sides. More ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap heap recently, they were cut up as follows:-W/E 31/7 No. 6681; W/E 7/8 Nos. 6653, 6689, 7959, 28535; W/E 14/8 Nos. 6870, 9273; W/E 21/8 Nos. 28097, 28367, 28586; W/E 28/8 Nos. 7948, 9309, 28088; W/E Nos. 7787, 8913, 28234. Class '5' 4-6-0 No. 4830, recently underwent a general repair and has now returned to traffic as a coal-burning engine |
SLS/194810 |
23/10/1948 | Templecombe | On 23/10 Nos. 3427, 43356 an 4557 were on local freight workings in this area, No. 44830 was on the Southbound 'Pines,' and No. 1298 (22E) worked the 4.5 p.m. through train from Templecombe to Burnham. Nos. 509 an 4102 were on shed. | SLS/194812 |
30/10/1948 | Crewe Works | The remaining nine 2-6-2T's of Order E471 are now in traffic. They were completed on the following dates:-Nos. 41221 (9/9), 41222 (13/9), 41223 (16/9), 41224 (21/9), 41225 (24/9), 41226 (28/9), 41227 (30/9), 41228 (5/10), and 41229 (8/10). The construction of a further batch of '2F' 2-6-0's is now well under way and the first five engines were completed as follows:-Nos. 46420 (14/10), 46421 (26/10), 46422 (22/10), 46423 (29/10), and 46424 (2/11). Three more 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0's have been rebuilt with tapered boilers-No. 45523 was completed on 20/9, No. 45545 on 8/10 and No 45536 on 26/10; No. 45545 has been named Planet. Another 'Royal Scot,' No. 6167, is at present in for rebuilding and - will probably be in traffic by the middle of December. During the past two months Nos. 44829/30 an 48064 have had their oil-burning apparatus removed, which seems to indicate that the other locomotives so fitted will be similarly dealt with as they pass through the shops. The ranks of ex L.N.W.R. engines continue to be steadily thinned and many more have gone to the scrap heap recently, they were cut up as follows:-W.E. 7/8 Nos. 6653/89, 7959, 28535; W.E. 14/8 Nos. 6870, 9270; W.E. 21/8 Nos. 28097, 28367, 28586; W.E. 28/8 Nos. 7948, 9309, 28088; W.E. 4/9 Nos. 7787, 8913, 28234; W.E. 11/9 Nos. 7756, 9136; WE. 18/9 Nos. 6691, 7840; W.E. 25/9 Nos. 7816, 27556, 28104; W.E. 2/10 No. 7721; W.E. 9/10 Nos. 7703, 28404; W.E. 16/10 Nos. 9152, 9165, 27681; W.E. 23/10 Nos. 7733, 28262, 28313, 28608; W.E. 30/10 No. 7954. During October considerable interest was aroused here by the arrival of five ex G.W.R. 0-6-0 pannier tanks Nos. 2021/67, 2115/50/85. These engines are at present undergoing repair and it is understood that more are to follow. |
SLS/194812 |
31/12/1948 | Crewe Works | New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
20/08/1954 | York Area | New BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0s 73053/54 (20A) joined 73045 at the end of June on the Holbeck working to York and Scarborough., During the Bank Holiday period. Horwich Moguls 42795/98 (20A) were also used on this turn, but it was worked on Saturday 7/8/54 by Jubilee 45605 (20A). Standard Diesel shunter 13127 from Darlington Works arrived at York on 21/7/54 hauled by Diesel 12115, which was returning from Darlington Works to Hull. 13127 proceeded to New England later in the day. The Class Y8 shed pilot at York (formerly 8091) has been renumbered Departmental 55. Class B17 61660 (30A) was working on passenger trains between York and Doncaster from 22/7/54 until 24/7/54. York-Scarborough line LMR Stanier Class 5 4-6-0s working on through duties to Scarborough in July and August have included 44660 (21A), 44830 (19B), 44928 (25A), 44986 (19B), 45237 (25B)-on an excursion from Burton-on-Trent-45259 (10C), 45261 (25A), and 45336 (26A); also Standard 4-6-0 73016 (19B). Class 4F 0-4-0 43963 (21A) also worked through from King's Norton to Scarborough on 24/7/54. K3 61889 (31B) worked the up Scarborough Flyer between Scarborough and York on 7/8/54 and on the same day 61947 (31B) worked the 4.45 p:m. from York to Scarborough. On 24/7/54 the 2.12 p.m. from Scarborough to Kings Cross was worked to York by K3 61980 (38B). An unusual B1 at Scarborough on 25/7/54 was 61331 (34A) on an excursion from Penistone. |
SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4830 Built at Crewe Works |
||
22/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C) | ||
04/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44830 | ||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) | ||
17/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
23/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (16C) | ||
25/12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
20/08/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
19/08/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44830 | ||
01/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |