Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2598 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16004 Week
» 69020 Month
» 188547 Year
» 3215400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4842 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
44842 |
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 10/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/01/1968 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4842 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
06/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44842 |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
04/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (27F) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (27F) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44842 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|