Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2058 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19861 Week
» 72877 Month
» 192404 Year
» 3219257 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4850 |
m/e |
11/1944 |
British Railways |
44850 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 11/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/07/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1966 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1944 |
20A |
|
Holbeck (MR) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
66B |
|
Motherwell |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/07/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4850 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44850 |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
14/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44850 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|