Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 102 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17905 Week
» 70921 Month
» 190448 Year
» 3217301 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4854 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
44854 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1944 |
20A |
|
Holbeck (MR) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
55E |
|
Normanton |
4w/e |
15/07/1967 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
55E |
Normanton |
4w/e |
15/07/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/09/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
23/01/1954 |
Holbeck MPD |
Holbeck shed now provides the motive power for the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City (8.46 a.m. from Bradford) to Scarborough instead of Neville Hill (50B). The engine returns on the 12.38 p.m. Scarborough to York, 3.10 p.m. York to Leeds, empties to Neville Hill, and light engine to Holbeck. Amongst 20A engines noted on this turn have been Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's 44852, 44854, 44943, 44944, an 45238, together with 44755 (Caprotti) and 73045 (standard B.R.), and 44901 of 68A complete with snowplough. |
SLS/195403 |
02/07/1967 |
Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Normanton) |
Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). |
SLS/196708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4854 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44854 |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44854 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|