Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2148 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19951 Week
» 72967 Month
» 192494 Year
» 3219347 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4863 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
44863 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
170 |
To Service |
During 01/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/05/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
EXLOAN |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
1E |
Bletchley |
3w/e |
06/02/1965 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
10/07/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4863 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44863 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44863 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|