Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18377 Week
» 71393 Month
» 190920 Year
» 3217773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4878 |
m/e |
05/1945 |
British Railways |
44878 |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 05/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/07/1968 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-Nos. *40667 (3778) 7/9; 42878 (4171) 5/9; 44878 (9362) 20/9; 44968 (10593) 5/9; 44979 (10604) 8/9; 45015 (9473) 29/9; 45155 (10547) 10/9; 45156 (9260) 14/9; 45169 (9169) 21/9; 45173 (9277) 15/9; 45213 (9317) 19/9; 45355 (9827) 9/9; 45366 (9602) 13/9; 45443 (9271) 6/9; *45461 (9717) 8/9; 45477 (9823) 22/9; 45478 (9824) 22/9; 45643 (10503) 19/9; *54453 (6052) 24/9; 54649 (2680) 13/9; 55166 9/9; *55159 15/9; 55201 21/9; 55212 8/9; 56340 28/9; 56368 29/9; *57247 (885) 24/9. *Retains L.M.S. on tank or tender sides. With the exception of Nos. 45461, 54453 and 54649, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number-plates. Commencing on 5/9, the colour of the numbers and letters was changed from white to cream; the original dimensions being retained. Several locomotives have been treated with a full paint schedule-three undercoats, one coat of enamel and two coats of varnish. The first to be dealt with was No. **57360 (876), which was completed in the Erecting Shop during W/E 11/9, but subsequent engines have been sent to the Varnish Shop for completion as follows:-Nos. **55233 25/9; **57236 (6029) 14/9; **57238 (990) 25/9; **57309 (947) 16/9; **57368 (6005) 23/9; **57651 (1732) 21/9. On 30/9 a new departure was made when No. **40188 received 8' numerals and 6' letters. **Fitted with new smokebox numberplates. |
SLS/194811 |
28/02/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 572. 40605, 637. 40906. 41147. 42780. 42832. 43849/99, 44783. 4796, 44878/80. 44967. 45010/16/49. 45115/66167/77/79, 45357/58. 45481/91, 45582, 45713/15/16. 14441. 54462/77, 14499, 54504, 55229, 16157, 16266, 16343, 57307/60, 17366. 17459. 17666. 57686. 17691. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4878 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44878 |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44878 |
|
|
02/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|