31/08/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-*40636(4341) 15/7; 40665(3804) 30/6; 40920(3256) 14/6; 40921(4267) 17/6; 41146(3795) 14/7; 41147(3792) 10/6; 41149(4166) 3/6; 41177(3340) 18/6; 41183(3530) 9/7; 42204 26/6; 42215 1/7; 42699 11/6; 42745(4171) 3/8; 42805(4015) 24/6; 42884(4212) 25/5; 42908(4263) 3/6; *42912(4274) 15/7; 43884(2977) 4/7; 44008(3098) 1/7; 44016(3105) 14/7; 44877(10502) 8/7; 44880(10505) 20/6; 44952(10577) 13/7; 44958(10583) 15/6; 44970(10595) 4/7; 44974(10599) 17/6; 45008(9845) 15/7; 45022(9511) 2/7; 45053(9032) 11/6; *45084(9116) 8/7; 45085(9266) 9/7; 45086(9180) 18/6; 45090(9821) 30/6; 45125(9229) 6/7; 45126(9720) 24/6; 45162(9714) 14/7; 45226(9502) 16/6; 45363(9211) 11/7; 45467(9176) 31/5; 45472(9679) 7/6; 45475(9070) 29/6; 45490(9120) 20/6; 45576(9022) 14/6; 45645(9818) 31/5; 45729(9723) 3/6; 47536 22/6; 54491(6191) 3/6; 54506(6212) 11/7; 55126 26/6; 55191 13/6; 55196 15/7; 55219 6/8; 55228 6/7; 55232 8/6; 55240 8/7; 55263 9/7; 55360 22/6; 56269 6/6; 56279 11/6; 56315 23/6; 56327 5/8; 56341 10/6; 56346 15/6; 57245(6058) 5/7; 57264(937) 16/6; 57323(957) 14/7; 57332(6038) 29/6; 57338(1764) 2/8; 57358(1723) 21/6; 57397(1292) 6/7; 57430(6021) 24/6; 57467(1304) 4/8; 57583(1664) 2/7; *57619(1777) 30/6; 57632(1713) 11/7; 57635(1683) 18/6; 57659(1761) 11/6; 57661(1775) 18/6; *57686(1767) 13/7; 57690(1771) 4/6. *Retains L.M.S. on tender. In addition, No. M5359 was re-numbered 45359 on 13/7, tender No. 9060. Locomotives on Works at commencement of Annual Holiday, 16/7. Erecting Shop: Nos. 908, 1136, 2745, 4234/81, 5047, 5455/57/74/99, 5560, 14464/73, 14639, 15164, 15219, 16327, 17337/38, 17453/67, 17599. Yard: No. 16025 (Works' shunter, awaiting shop repairs).Dump: Nos. 905, M5575, 14448, 14649 (all awaiting shop repairs), 15116 (minus boiler; withdrawn W/E 29/5), 17374 (withdrawn W/E 22/5) and 17422 (minus boiler; agreed for breaking up 7/6). No. 16025 , the Works' 'pug,' burst a tube on 12/7 and No. 17254 (31A) was used as a substitute until the commencement of the Works' Annual Holiday. No. 16025 went into shops for a service repair on 2/8; No. 16030 (31E) having arrived to act as Works' shunter. No. 15116 was towed into the shops ex dump on 2/8 and was cut-up during the ensuing week |
SLS/194809 |
28/02/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 572. 40605, 637. 40906. 41147. 42780. 42832. 43849/99, 44783. 4796, 44878/80. 44967. 45010/16/49. 45115/66167/77/79, 45357/58. 45481/91, 45582, 45713/15/16. 14441. 54462/77, 14499, 54504, 55229, 16157, 16266, 16343, 57307/60, 17366. 17459. 17666. 57686. 17691. |
SLS/195004 |
06/07/1961 |
St. Rollox MPD (Ex-Works) |
Ex-Works: 42176, 44880. |
SLS/196108 |
18/01/1964 |
Bedford MPD (In shops) |
Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. |
SLS/196403 |
03/09/1964 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped in 25 weeks ending 29th August) |
Shopped in 25 weeks ending 29th August: 44880, 44999, 45011, 45194, 64620, 65915, 76096, 76114, 80128, D3552, D3902, D5328, D6110/20/43/46, D8029/33/34. Scrapped 9th-28th March: 61117, 45465. no scrapping after that date. In Shops: 44956, 45016, 45213, 78054, D2414, D6116/17/19/38/41/52/55/56, D8576. Stored: 62712. In the above period there were unscheduled repairs on 13 steam locomotives and 70 diesel locomotives. The Clayton locomotives are being fitted with AWS, ten to date. (I regret the length of time which has elapsed between this and the last report but the epidemic prevented visits). |
SLS/196410 |