|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/10/1961 | Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. | SLS/196111 |
16/02/1968 | CarnforthMPD | Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. | SLS/196803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4894 Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) | ||
28/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44894 | ||
15/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) | ||
14/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
13/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) | ||
15/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) | ||
30/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J) | ||
31/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
19/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C) | ||
10/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) | ||
10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44894 | ||
05/1969 | Scrapped | Scrapped |