Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 662 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14068 Week
» 67084 Month
» 186611 Year
» 3213464 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4913 |
m/e |
11/1945 |
British Railways |
44913 |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 11/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/07/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4913 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (7B) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (7B) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44913 |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
29/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44913 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|