Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1055 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14461 Week
» 67477 Month
» 187004 Year
» 3213857 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4914 |
m/e |
12/1945 |
British Railways |
44914 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 12/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/08/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1968 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1945 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2D |
|
Banbury |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
2B |
|
Oxley |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
9F |
|
Heaton Mersey |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2D |
Banbury |
5w/e |
08/01/1966 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Oxley |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
ALLOC |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
4w/e |
31/12/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4914 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44914 |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (2D) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44914 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|