Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 2395 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15801 Week
» 68817 Month
» 188344 Year
» 3215197 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4921 |
m/e |
01/1946 |
British Railways |
44921 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 01/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 26/02/1965 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4921 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (19E) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44921 |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
12/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fort William (63D) |
|
|
27/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
26/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44921 |
|
|
06/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|