Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1374 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14780 Week
» 67796 Month
» 187323 Year
» 3214176 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4930 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
44930 |
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 03/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/05/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4930 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44930 |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44930 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|