Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2963 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16369 Week
» 69385 Month
» 188912 Year
» 3215765 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4938 |
m/e |
11/1945 |
British Railways |
44938 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 11/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4938 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44938 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44938 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|