Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18839 Week
» 71855 Month
» 191382 Year
» 3218235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4940 |
m/e |
11/1945 |
British Railways |
44940 |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 11/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/03/1968 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4940 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44940 |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44940 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|