Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4945 |
m/e |
01/1946 |
British Railways |
44945 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 01/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/10/1966 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/07/1948 |
S. & D. Jt. Line |
The new Class '4' 2-6-0's -from-Bristol (22A)-have appeared at Bournemouth on the 'Pines Express.' On 3/7, the north-bound 'Pines' was in three portions, being worked by Nos. 2900 (21A), 44523 an 4945. No. 4569 (22A) was on a southbound relief, while No. 1425 (22E) appeared on the 9.40 a.m. from Burnham |
SLS/194809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4945 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44945 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (2J) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44945 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|