Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1625 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25256 Week
» 90210 Month
» 292874 Year
» 3319727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4947 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
British Railways |
44947 |
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 02/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/06/1968 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4947 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
06/05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44947 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44947 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|