Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4983 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
44983 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
5MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
183 |
To Service |
During 09/1946 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1968 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1946 |
20A |
|
Holbeck (MR) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
29A |
Perth South |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
EXLOAN |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/09/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/07/1967 |
Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Holbeck) |
Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). |
SLS/196708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4983 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44983 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44983 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|