|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Crewe Works | During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known. Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F). |
SLS/194905 |
27/11/1966 | Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) | Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. | SLS/196701 |
31/12/1966 | Colwick MPD (Stored) | Stored 44847/941/84, 45224/89, 48083/143/361/70/88/651/62/72. Also on shed Dept.29 in steam. | SLS/196702 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1946 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4984 Built at Horwich Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) | ||
26/03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44984 | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bedford (15D) | ||
06/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) | ||
17/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
18/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bedford (14E) | ||
06/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
01/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15D) | ||
11/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (16B) | ||
25/12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
25/12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (16A) | ||
12/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44984 | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |