|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/08/1947 | Stafford Station | On 7/8 'Prince of Wales' No. 25752 was noted here repainted, whilst L.N.E.R. No. 5013 was on the shed. | SLS/194709 |
31/05/1948 | St. Rollox Works | Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-40154 25/4; 40176 24/5; 40189 16/4; 40570 (3508) 22/4; 40613 (3465) 4/5; 40620 (3509) 6/5; 40624 (3957) 16/4; *40641 (3325) 20/4; 40664 (3515) 28/4; 40670 (3960) 17/5; 40689 (3533) 23/5; *41092 (2861) 28/4; 41132 (4148) 28/4; 41145 (4348) 16/4; 41176 (3529) 16/5; 41180 (3890) 8/4; 42201 5/4; 42415 23/4; 42417 13/5; 42751 (4188) 10/5; 42780 (4442) 20/5; 42802 (3310) 28/5; 42809 (3956) 21/5; 42830 (3772) 1/4; 42834 (3911) 7/4; 42876 (4211) 5/4; 43902 (2991) 14/5; 44330 (3825) 13/4;; 44795 (10685) 21/4; *44799 (10689) 5/5;; 44931 (10556) 11/5; *44959 (10584) 6/4; 44973 (10598) 29/4; 44991 (10616) 30/4; 45009 (9264) 7/5; 45013 (9511) 10/4; 45014 (9184) 28/4; *45087 (9724) 7/4; 45100 (9261) 26/5; 45115 (9278) 12/5; 45116 (9060) 15/4; *45119 (9365) 22/4; 45122 (9265) 8/4; 45124 (9214) 22/4; 45153 (9314) 28/4; 45157 (9545) 5/5; 45166 (9210) 28/4; 45167 (9181) 30/4; 45171 (9194) 17/5; 45177 (9659) 16/5; *45251 (9276) 2/4; 45357 (9534) 13/4; 45360 (9715) 23/4; 45389 (9625) 9/4; *45423 (9595) 8/4; *45456 (9059) 16/4; 45464 (9296) 30/5; 45469 (9596) 19/4; 45482 (9828) 24/5; 45487 (9833) 20/5; 45491 (9538) 23/5; *45577 (9027) 6/4; 45581 (9077) 12/4; 45715 (3944) 27/4; 45730 (9709) 22/4; 47163 20/4; 54438 (6057) 5/4; *54444 (2662) 16/4; 54445 (6062) 30/4; 54455 (6182) 20/5; *54471 (6178) 24/5; 55138 23/4; 55178 1/6; 55210 20/5; 55356 8/4; 56038 30/4; 56153 18/5; 56238 9/4; 56249 2/6; 56254 2/6; 56272 23/4; 56281 20/4; 56310 15/4; 56359 28/4; 57243 (927) 20/4;; 57261 (1757) 4/5;; 57268 (1659) 6/5;; 57289 (1738) 14/4;; 57291 (1741) 21/5; 57292 (1635) 26/5; *57298 (936) 30/4; 57307 (971) 11/5; 57310 (1231) 13/5; 57389 (1309) 25/5; 57464 (1327) 24/5; *57556 (1632) 24/5; 57562 (1643) 26/4; 57573 (1693) 7/5; 57588 (1669) 27/5; 57608 (1689) 12/5; 57631 (1712) 28/5; 57665 (1746) 19/4; 57695 (1874) 23/5. *Retains L.M.S. on tender. Nos. 4998 and 4999 entered the Varnish Shop on 17/5 and 18/5 respectively, where they have since been painted black with red, white and grey lining and re-numbered 44998 and 44999 in straw numerals. New smokebox number plates have also been fitted. No. M914 arrived at the Works on 4/5 with L.M.S. tender No. 3188, having exchanged its British Railways tender (4014) with engine No. 2910 at Corkerhill. The engine has since been renumbered 40914 (on 17/5) but retains L.M.S. on the tender. No. 56020 returned to the Works on 5/5 after running-in trials and was loaded on to a 40-ton well wagon on 12/5 and despatched, with its wheels and material in a 12-ton open wagon to Burton-on-Trent shed on 14/5. Nos. 16279 an 16341 arrived at the Works on 26/5 still retaining smokebox number plates-since removed |
SLS/194807 |
15/11/1963 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). | SLS/196312 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5013 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 229 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
17/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45013 | ||
30/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) | ||
06/01/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
05/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45013 from Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
09/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |