|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | St Rollox Works | The following locomotives have been painted in the temporary B.R. livery, i.e. unlined black with plain white lettering (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date):-Nos. 615 (4458) 9/2; 642 (4340) 18/2; 666 (4339) 1/3; 914 (4014) 17/2; 938 (4457) 26/2; 1138 (3555) 24/2; 2736 (4170) 29/2; 2749 (3336) 26/2; 2914 (4272) 20/2; 4323 (3817) 20/2; 5012 (9064) 9/2; 5018 (9829) 20/2; 5081 (9069) 2/2; 5082 (9005) 4/2; 5117 (9179) 24/2; 5127 (9713) 10/2; 5359 (9599) 19/2; 5459 (9593) 27/2; 5575 (9023) 10/2; 8185 (9912) 5/2; 8303 (10030) 12/2; 14476 (6173) 16/2; 14487 (6179) 25/2; 14501 (6209) 11/2; 17269 (910) 16/2; 17600 (1681) 11/2 and 17666 (1747) 12/2. No. 17313 arrived in the shops ex the dump on 20/2 and was cut up on 23/2. The boiler (Class N34 No. 1161) is to be repaired and used again | SLS/194804 |
30/08/1961 | St. Rollox Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D3005, D3206/78, D3913, D5314/6/7, D6116, 42059, 44877, 44976, 45011/23/49, 45245, 45360, 45679/91. Paint Shop: 44703. Outside Paint Shop: 42805, 45366, 45677. Works Yard: D5309, 44721, 45018, 57617, 57658. Works Shunter: D3342. | SLS/196110 |
27/06/1965 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. | SLS/196508 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5018 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 234 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Inverness (60A) | ||
18/03/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45018 | ||
18/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aviemore (60B) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) | ||
05/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) | ||
28/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
18/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (26C) | ||
23/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
24/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45018 | ||
06/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |