|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40150, 1110, 42163, 2801, 42808/36, 44318, 44700/97, 44958/72, 45036/47, 45122/27/51/58/63/69, 45364/66, 45461/70/89, 45579, 45644/92, 45715, 47163, 14507, 55161, 15199, 15218, 55233, 15361, 56025. 16166, 56239, 16285/92, 16316. 56336/69, 17242, 57340, 17354/84, 57599, 17672. No. 45575 is to be the first locomotive painted in the new green livery at St. Rollox. It will be noticed that the Works' shunter-No. 56025- is under repair, which is being replaced temporarily by No. 16035, which is on loan. | SLS/195002 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5036 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4581 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) | ||
15/01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45036 | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
23/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
20/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
07/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
29/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45036 | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |